Accounts and annual returns WELBODI PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1125217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 28 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 25 March 2025 359 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 25 March 2025 359 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 04 May 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 04 May 2022 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window