Financial history WELBODI PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1125217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £206.88k £411.15k £430.03k £877.35k £686.14k
Total expenditure £165.15k £500.01k £356.15k £887.37k £650.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £40.70k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £123.72k £96.74k £40.70k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £887.35k £28.40k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £647.96k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £9.78k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £831.51k £573.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £831.51k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £55.86k £77.21k