Accounts and annual returns HOMES WITH HEART

Charity number: 1126389
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 20 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 20 April 2013 27 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 April 2013 10 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 20 April 2012 11 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 April 2012 13 January 2013 On Time