WOLVERHAMPTON WANDERERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wolves Community Trust began operation as a registered charity in December 2008. The department is based around five thematic areas: Sports Participation Health Education & Enterprise Social Inclusion Community Donations via Wolves Aid. In addition, Wolves Community Trust is involved in a variety of projects funded by the Premier League or Football League Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income:
£2,100,142
Donations and legacies | £89.32k | |
Charitable activities | £1.80m | |
Other trading activities | £215.01k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,959,780
Raising funds | £245.40k | |
Charitable activities | £1.71m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £245.40k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.71m | |
Retained for future use | £140.36k |
People

74 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Dudley
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Telford & Wrekin
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 19 November 2008: Standard registration
- WOLVES COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- WOLVES COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Alan Rogers | Chair | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Welch | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caren Elizabeth Tonks | Trustee | 04 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Robert Purssell | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Wild | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD IAN SKIRROW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57m | £1.56m | £2.05m | £2.20m | £2.10m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13m | £1.07m | £1.54m | £1.80m | £1.96m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £55.00k | £55.00k | £260.62k | £426.67k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £33.30k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £169.15k | £155.30k | £130.65k | £159.11k | £89.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £249.62k | £127.51k | £274.57k | £191.54k | £215.01k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.15m | £1.28m | £1.65m | £1.85m | £1.80m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £8.84k | £29.79k | £29.79k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £981.40k | £1.44m | £1.61m | £1.71m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £63.92k | £89.63k | £105.43k | £187.29k | £245.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £6.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £513.11k | £445.29k | £409.93k | £374.84k | £339.99k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.91m | £2.63m | £2.57m | £3.24m | £3.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.02m | £1.18m | £578.10k | £812.48k | £956.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS:- (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND; BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE THE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; (D) TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF PERSONS OR GROUPS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN RESIDENTS IN WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS OR WHO HAVING LIVED OUTSIDE THAT GEOGRAPHICAL AREA HAVE BEEN OR ARE ASSOCIATED WITH THE ACTIVITIES OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREARS; AND (E) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOLINEUX STADIUM
WATERLOO ROAD
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV1 4QR
- Phone:
- 07813015347
- Email:
- willclowes@wolves.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window