Accounts and annual returns PETERBOROUGH ANGLIA SIKH ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1128312
Charity reporting is overdue by 749 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Annual return 01 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 383 days
Annual return 01 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 749 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 749 days
Annual return 01 July 2021 06 May 2023 370 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2020 24 March 2022 327 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required