FRIENDS OF PAXTON PITS NATURE RESERVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through volunteer action, The Friends works to: enhance habitat and create new habitat for wildlife at Paxton Pits; achieve expansion of the nature reserve; enhance visitor facilities and the visitor experience; promote and provide information about the Reserve and its wildlife through public events, publications and the Reserve website, and support informal and formal educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
140 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 July 2008: Standard registration
- FPPNR (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Arthur Anderson-Brown | Chair | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Biggs | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carina Jasmine McKee | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Matthews | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Woodhead | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neal Parkin | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Crosby | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jean Barwell | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Wilson | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Runchman | Trustee | 04 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mike Thomas | Trustee | 28 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.23k | £57.17k | £90.14k | £67.41k | £92.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.90k | £47.70k | £52.60k | £75.59k | £152.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 2007 as amended on 13 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF PAXTON PITS NATURE RESERVE BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paxton Pits Nature Reserve
Visitor Centre
High Street
Little Paxton
ST. NEOTS
PE19 6ET
- Phone:
- 01480406795
- Email:
- friends@paxton-pits.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window