Trustees FRIENDS OF PAXTON PITS NATURE RESERVE

Charity number: 1125221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Arthur Anderson-Brown Chair 17 February 2021
None on record
Maxine Biggs Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Carina Jasmine Watson Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Stephen Matthews Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Jane Woodhead Trustee 14 April 2024
None on record
Neal Parkin Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Ian Michael Crosby Trustee 17 February 2021
None on record
Alison Jean Barwell Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
David Wilson Trustee 19 September 2017
None on record
Martin Runchman Trustee 04 June 2014
None on record
Mike Thomas Trustee 28 October 2013
None on record