Financial history FRIENDS OF THE DISCOVERY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1125825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.41k £9.38k £30.67k £30.88k £27.67k
Total expenditure £22.75k £4.32k £28.84k £28.86k £28.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A