MONMOUTH COMPREHENSIVE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the educational experience of the students at Monmouth Comprehensive School by supplementing the educational provision and facilities at the school for sport, art, music, ICT and subjects of the National Curriculum where the funds made avilable by Government for the purpose of meeting the cost of the same and by supporting the health and welfare of the students at the School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 21 November 2008: Standard registration
- 12 March 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.37k | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £1.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1417 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1417 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1782 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 3 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT MONMOUTH COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
MONMOUTHSHIRE HEREFORDSHIRE AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window