SANITA MERALI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are to support and advance medical research and community facilities. A core interest of the charity is to facilitate the progression of cancer research and care. The latter objective refers to the charity's interest in the improvement of community facilities to ensure inclusivity for all members of society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON ENGLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Farah Merali | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nimah Merali | Trustee | 25 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MURTAZA GULAMABBAS MERALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.81k | £353.74k | £606.46k | £373.81k | £362.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.08k | £183.23k | £168.14k | £183.21k | £245.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £13.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £593.46k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £12.52k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £155.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.52k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £155.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 20 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE KHOJA SHIA ITHNA-ASHERI FAITH; THE TREATMENT OR CARE OF INDIVIDUALS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR CANCEROUS DISEASES AND/OR ANY OTHER PURPOSE RELATING TO THE TREATMENT OF OR RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PROGRESS AND EFFECTS OF CANCER.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
209-211 Whitham Road
SHEFFIELD
S10 2SP
- Phone:
- 01142666111
- Email:
- info@merali-lettings.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window