Accounts and annual returns BREATHTAKERS OB TRUST
Charity number: 1125330
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 25 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 25 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | 24 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | 24 July 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 25 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 25 June 2014 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window