PACE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PACE provides opportunities for disabled people to access sports and leisure activities. In addition, it delivers multi-sports and physical activity programmes to a range of organisations such as day centres for adults with severe and complex health and communication difficulties, mainstream and special schools and colleges and other disability organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KRISHNA DEVI BIRDY | Chair | 22 February 2007 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Logothetis | Trustee | 22 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
EVI SIDERI | Trustee | 22 February 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £9.15k | £5.61k | £9.08k | £6.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £7.86k | £7.98k | £8.00k | £6.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 2008 as amended on 04 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
To act as a resource for disabled people in the London Borough of Ealing and the surrounding area by providing advice and assistance and organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of: a) advancing in life and helping those people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities. b) providing sports, recreational and leisure time activities in the interest of social welfare.
Area of benefit
EALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 BARN HILL
WEMBLEY
HA9 9LF
- Phone:
- 07930748280
- Email:
- krishna@pacezone.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window