Accounts and annual returns LIFEBUILDER (UK)

Charity Number: 1129634
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2011 07 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2011 17 August 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 November 2010 29 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2010 29 June 2011 On Time