DONCASTER GRAND THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 1126491
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We have actively sought to raise the profile of the Theatre and recruit new members to our Friends group by organising history talks with local groups. We have attended events with our exhibition stall. We have run fund raising activities such as sales and continue to hold theatrical events. We continue to engage with other stakeholders to promote the benefits of the Theatre within the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £496
Total expenditure: £555

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET HERBERT Chair
THE DONCASTER CIVIC TRUST
Received: On time
Scott Hanson Hanson Trustee 01 February 2015
None on record
IAN SUNDERLAND Trustee
None on record
JONATHAN GAY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £900 £1.05k £1.01k £2.13k £496
Total expenditure £594 £423 £549 £463 £555
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Room 209
St. Catherines House
Tickhill Road
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN4 8QP
Phone:
01302857126