AMARA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of mental & emotional suffering of children in need by reasons of, primarily, parental/guardian loss, abandonment, abuse, neglect, in particular by the provision of therapeutic care and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Mongolia
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
- 02 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £5.00k | £5.21k | £521 | £558 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49k | £5.00k | £4.97k | £287 | £508 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 February 2017 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 May 2016 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 27 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 31 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL SUFFERING OF CHILDREN IN NEED BY REASONS OF, PRIMARILY, PARENTAL/GUARDIAN LOSS, ABANDONMENT, ABUSE, NEGLECT, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF THE THERAPEUTIC CARE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window