OLNEY INFANT SCHOOL SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School Non-Official Fund for the advancement of education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 19 September 2008: Standard registration
- 16 January 2013: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.95k | £19.99k | £28.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.28k | £20.22k | £23.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 13 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 11 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF OLNEY INFANT SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
OLNEY INFANT SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window