ASYLUM SUPPORT HOUSING ADVICE

Charity Number: 1129311
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of human rights and the provision of information, advice and support to refused asylum seekers and refugees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £21,090
Total expenditure: £11,678

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackburn With Darwen
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 April 2009: Standard registration
  • 21 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 21 June 2016: Funds transferred to 1123908 GREATER MANCHESTER IMMIGRATION AID UNIT
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £7.34k £27.94k £29.75k £13.09k £21.09k
Total expenditure £21.89k £29.16k £27.54k £14.24k £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 29 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 31 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 30 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 31 January 2014 On Time