SANSKRITI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On line Hindi and other Indic computing languages. Yoga & avurveda conference. Inter-faith understanding. Study of scriptures - round table meetings. Festival celebrations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Cardiff
- Leicestershire
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Nottingham City
- Slough
Governance
- 23 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RITU TRIVEDI | Trustee | 07 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARUN KUMAR Trivedi | Trustee | 15 August 2008 |
|
|
||||
Dr ARUN KUMAR TRIVEDI SECRETARY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.59k | £5.62k | £6.43k | £5.50k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.12k | £2.34k | £2.93k | £3.91k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 September 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF INDIA, INCLUDING ART, MUSIC, INDIAN SYSTEMS OF MEDICINE, INDIAN CULTURE AND HERITAGE AND THE HINDI LANGUAGE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT; AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 5
Britannia House
Palgrave Road
BEDFORD
BEDFORDSHIRE
MK42 9BY
- Phone:
- 07912645900
- Email:
- sochonaa@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window