Financial history THE SURREY HILLS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1125532
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.52k £21.53k £64.37k £80.35k £193.29k
Total expenditure £30.80k £15.73k £44.31k £73.46k £115.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £65.90k
Income from government grants N/A £6.40k £10.13k N/A N/A