FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL - PRIVATE SCHOOL FUND TAKING IT ON CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
None this year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 10 September 2008: Standard registration
- FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL - PRIVATE SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BETHAN SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN Cole | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL BY CREATING AN INFORMAL LEARNING ENVIRONMENT, WHICH SEEKS TO SUPPORT CHILDREN'S LEARNING THAT IS NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL BY CREATING, PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING HEALTH LIFESTYLES FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES THAT IS NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING A SECURE AND POSITIVE CHILDCARE RESOURCE WITHIN THE COMMUNITY WHICH ENABLES PARENTS AND CARERS TO ACCESS WORK AND TRAINING AND WHICH IS NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRAMWELLGATE MOOR PRIMARY
NEWTON DRIVE
DURHAM
DH1 5BG
- Phone:
- 01913865400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window