Financial history KIYAN PRINCE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1125481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £110.18k £44.30k £89.49k £66.52k £196.68k
Total expenditure £64.65k £57.20k £71.87k £93.20k £187.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.51k N/A N/A N/A N/A