Financial history PENELOPE MARTIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127485
Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £34.57k £30.03k £25.98k £21.59k £21.36k
Total expenditure £109.94k £136.27k £174.80k £162.56k £60.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A