THE PARISH OF THE DORMITION OF THE MOTHER OF GOD (ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE AN ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY WHO MEET TO CELEBRATE THE VIGIL AND LITURGY ON THE 1ST, 3RD AND 5TH WEEKENDS OF EACH MONTH AND SPECIAL FEAST DAYS. SERVICES ARE IN ENGLISH AND CHURCH SLAVONIC. THERE ARE BAPTISMS, WEDDINGS, RETREATS AND ANNUAL BAZAAR. WE LOOK FOR A PERMANENT PLACE OF WORSHIP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 August 2008: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 August 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr TAMARA DRAGADZE | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|||||
ANNE VON BENNIGSEN | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY CARTER | Trustee | 15 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANE MOURA COLLINGRIDGE | Trustee | 14 July 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.38k | £38.37k | £31.17k | £28.56k | £41.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £127.35k | £9.51k | £16.72k | £30.99k | £28.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OR PROMOTION OF THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH. THE ORTHODOX CHRISTIAN FAITH SHALL MEAN THE FAITH OF THE ONE HOLY ORTHODOX-CATHOLIC AND APOSTOLIC CHURCH, ROOTED IN THE HOLY TRADITION, AND TAUGHT BY THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, THE SEVEN ECUMENICAL COUNCILS AND THE LOCAL AND PROVINCIAL COUNCILS, AND BY THE HOLY FATHERS, AND AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE CHURCHES OF THE FOUR ANCIENT PATRIARCHATES OF CONSTANTINOPLE JERUSALEM ANTIOCH AND ALEXANDRIA AND BY THE CHURCHES NOW IN COMMUNION WITH ANY OR ALL OF THEM.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 RYFOLD ROAD
LONDON
SW19 8DF
- Phone:
- 02087390101
- Email:
- mail@exarchate-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window