Accounts and annual returns STONEHAUGH COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1125384
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 11 March 2025 315 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 11 March 2025 315 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 17 May 2022 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 February 2022 284 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required