THE GOODMAN AND RUTHIN CHARITY

Charity number: 1126422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of housing for persons in need. Financial assistance towards training for employment and education Relief in need

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £164,337
Total expenditure: £137,070

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Denbighshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE GOODMAN AND RUTHIN CHARITY# (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
zoe henderson Trustee 09 July 2024
DISCOVERING OLD WELSH HOUSES GROUP
Received: On time
Rev luke Bristowe Trustee 01 December 2023
DYFFRYN CLWYD MISSION AREA
Received: On time
Martin Goldstein Trustee 01 December 2023
WREXHAM AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
Rev Gregory Kenneth Cameron Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Rev Huw Bryant Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Richard Barrie Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Nicholas Snape Trustee 12 April 2021
None on record
Gwynne Jones Trustee 12 April 2021
CARE & REPAIR CYMRU 2015
Received: 32 days late
Morfudd Jones Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
Rev NIGEL WILLIAMS Trustee 18 May 2012
FRIENDS OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £91.51k £95.67k £90.53k £100.73k £164.34k
Total expenditure £92.67k £87.66k £112.09k £107.85k £137.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 November 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 7 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1 (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT OF QUALIFYING YOUNG PERSONS (C) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION FOR QUALIFYING YOUNG PERSONS; (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (4) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 4(1)(A) OF THIS SCHEME.
Area of benefit
DENBIGHSHIRE AND FLINTSHIRE
Registration history
  • 25 November 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
LLYS GOODMAN
CHURCH WALKS
RUTHIN
CLWYD
LL15 1BW
Phone:
01824705241
Website:

No information available