WALKING FREE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Feeding and ministering to the homeless. Recovery group for those with hurts, habits and hang-ups. Choir whose members are recovering alcoholics and addicts and Walking Free Volunteers. Teaching and life-skills training. Christian discipleship, outreach training, connecting people with rehab and and online ministry of support throughout the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 08 August 2008: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 31 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 31 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETING, LECTURES, SERVICES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF DRUG AWARENESS, HOMELESSNESS AND OTHER RELATED. 3) THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF ADDICTION TO LIFE CONTROLLING SUBSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window