Financial history FAIR MOBILITY

Charity Number: 1126073
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £31.10k £18.18k £16.49k £7.58k £10.64k
Total expenditure £36.08k £29.97k £19.00k £14.11k £5.33k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A