AMAZON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to protect the Amazon rainforest by working with local traditional and indigenous communities, supporting their projects while they become self sufficient and protecting the natural resources around them. We take a community development approach that is economically sustainable, while enabling local people to preserve their natural resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brazil
Governance
- 20 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emanuela Evangelista | Trustee | 30 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PASLEY-TYLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.72k | £64.23k | £81.65k | £43.80k | £42.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.73k | £55.72k | £52.78k | £70.39k | £107.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 June 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 14 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE AMAZON RAINFOREST BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. 2 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF THE AMAZON RAINFOREST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A TO PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; B THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; C THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS 'DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 BERKELEY SQUARE
LONDON
W1J 5AW
- Phone:
- 02073180800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window