DURHAM SCRATCH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly singing classes in Durham. Occasional workshops for members of the community. Concerts for other charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 29 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Coral Sirett | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Andrews | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Michael Penn Dooley | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sarah Warner | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikki Lipinski | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bettison | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Frances Olney | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Wakefield | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael French | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Coppock | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Dineley | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Rigby | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81k | £3.15k | £6.18k | £9.88k | £10.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.66k | £3.80k | £6.29k | £10.30k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Bromley Close
High Shincliffe
Durham
DH1 2TZ
- Phone:
- 01913869537
- Email:
- bill.rigby1@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window