SRI NABH KAMAL RAJA SAHEB TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
place of worship for the conduct of marriages,funerals and other services according to rites of the said religion and social and physical training(jog classes)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 08 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANAK RAJ GANGOTRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARI SINGH CHEEMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ATMA SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVTAR SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HARIPAL MALHI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.41k | £98.31k | £61.89k | £83.82k | £166.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.39k | £78.93k | £63.72k | £60.35k | £81.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.99k | £10.68k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 September 2022 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, KEEP FIT AND YOGA CLASSES, LANGUAGE CLASSES, ARTS AND CRAFTS ACTIVITIES, HEALTH CARE AND OTHER COMMUNITY BASED ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAJA SAHEB HOUSE
196 MANSFIELD ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG1 3HX
- Phone:
- 01902687171
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window