METROPOLITAN POLICE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides financial assistance to serving, retired and ex Metropolitan Police Officers and their dependants in need by way of a monetary grant or interest free loan. Also allows officers free access to Flint House, the Police Rehabilitation Centre in Goring, where necessary and supports the Metropolitan and City Police Orphans Fund
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,193,183
Donations and legacies | £2.13m | |
Charitable activities | £59.37k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.18k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,459,269
Raising funds | £44.06k | |
Charitable activities | £2.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£517,630 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £44.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.42m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £44.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.42m | |
Retained for future use | £251.54k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve George | Trustee | 23 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ade Adelekan | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Slade | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Walmsley | Trustee | 24 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Gaskain | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Osborne | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andy Picton | Trustee | 08 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phil Van Tromp | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Deller | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53m | £2.51m | £2.43m | £2.25m | £2.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.83m | £2.72m | £2.60m | £2.60m | £2.46m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.37m | £2.36m | £2.33m | £2.20m | £2.13m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £50.88k | £51.68k | £51.72k | £53.76k | £59.37k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £114.06k | £94.59k | £54.58k | £45 | £1.18k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.80m | £2.70m | £2.58m | £2.56m | £2.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £23.45k | £22.95k | £22.21k | £40.91k | £44.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.26k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.21m | £3.56m | £3.29m | £2.93m | £2.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £355.83k | £24.74k | £293.13k | £278.50k | £517.63k | |
|
Other assets | £870.09k | £658.98k | £765.61k | £489.89k | £449.89k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £368.25k | £372.01k | £351.97k | £335.21k | £320.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
2.2.1 TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF: 2.2.1.1 OFFICERS OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE SERVICE (MPS); 2.2.1.2 FORMER OFFICERS (INCLUDING RETIRED OFFICERS ON MPS PENSIONS) OF THE MPS; 2.2.1.3 WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS OF SERVING AND RETIRED OFFICERS OF THE MPS (TO INCLUDE REGISTERED CIVIL PARTNERS OF DECEASED OFFICERS AND DECEASED RETIRED OFFICERS AND UNMARRIED PARTNERS OF DECEASED OFFICERS AND DECEASED RETIRED OFFICERS WHO COMPLETED A JOINT DECLARATION FOR THE PROVISION OF POLICE PENSION SURVIVOR BENEFITS OR ENTITLEMENTS); 2.2.1 A DEPENDANTS OF OFFICERS AND FORMER OFFICERS OF THE MPS, TO INCLUDE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED OFFICERS AND DECEASED FORMER OFFICERS OF THE MPS; 2.2.1.5 OFFICERS AND FORMER OFFICERS OF THE CITY OF LONDON POLICE; 2.2.1.6 NECESSITOUS ORPHANS OF OFFICERS AND FORMER OFFICERS OF THE MPS AND THE CITY OF LONDON POLICE (WHERE ORPHANS SHALL INCLUDE THOSE AS DEFINED IN THE RULES OF THE METROPOLITAN AND CITY POLICE ORPHANS FUND (REGISTERED CHARITY NUMBER 234787) (THE ORPHANS FUND)); 2.2.2 IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.2.2.1 ASSISTING THOSE WHO QUALIFY UNDER CLAUSE 2.2.1.1 AND WHO ARE SICK OR INJURED; 2.2.2.2 ASSISTING THOSE WHO QUALIFY UNDER CLAUSES 2.2.1.1, 2.2.1.3 AND 2.2.1.6 AND WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; 2.2.2.3 ASSISTING THOSE WHO QUALIFY UNDER CLAUSES 2.2.1.1, 2.2.1.2 AND 2.2.1.5 WHO ARE CONSIDERED DESERVING OF ASSISTANCE ON ACCOUNT OF SICKNESS (WHETHER OF THEMSELVES OR THEIR FAMILIES) OR OF INJURIES RECEIVED IN THE COURSE OF THEIR DUTIES OR FOR ANY OTHER REASON; 2.2.2.4 MAKING GRANTS TO SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME EXIST FOR THE RELIEF OF THOSE DESCRIBED IN CLAUSES 2.2.1.4 AND 2.2.1.6 INCLUDING THE ORPHANS FUND; 2.2.2.5 ASSISTING THOSE WHO QUALIFY UNDER CLAUSES 2.2.1.1 TO 2^2.1.6 INCLUSIVE IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, PROVIDED THAT THESE SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MPS Charities Section
2nd Floor (South)
Kilburn Police Station
38 Salusbury Road
London
NW6 6LT
- Phone:
- 02071610265
- Email:
- welfarefunds@met.police.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window