DRAGON'S DAYCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dragons Daycare is an organisation which aims to provide the local community with a high quality, yet affordable childcare service. We provide both 'wrap around' care for both the children of school age, and also nursery education for children. In addition we provide 'playgroup plus' early education for three year olds. We are able to provide care for 31 children from the age of 2-16.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 09 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Marie Wrench | Trustee | 09 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN CARROLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATIE CLEVERLEY ITHEU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANA DUCKWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.36k | £78.90k | £114.46k | £106.36k | £97.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.93k | £84.87k | £97.58k | £104.63k | £116.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £52.47k | N/A | £54.43k | £66.87k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.19k | £14.11k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 14 October 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 September 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) ENCOURAGING PARENTS/GUARDIANS TO SUPPORT, UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN. B) PROVIDE THE NECESSARY SAFE; HIGH QUALITY AND GROUP PLAY IN WHICH PARENTS/GUARDIANS HAVE THE RIGHT TO TAKE PART. C) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVIDING OF THE EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. D) ENCOURAGING OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH PARENTS/GUARDIANS MAY HELP THE CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINE. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SCHOOL HOUSE
TANYFRON ROAD
TANYFRON
WREXHAM
LL11 5SA
- Phone:
- 01978753773
- Email:
- dragonsdaycare@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window