Financial history KINAMBA COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1126601
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £99.40k £134.87k £105.31k £109.04k £140.50k
Total expenditure £82.43k £117.17k £96.21k £99.81k £125.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A