CARISBROOKE PRIORY TRUST COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust exists to meet the needs of and support those who are sick or in distress, through the provision of listening, prayer, shelter (the Priory) and other services as part of the healing ministry of the Christian Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 23 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert John White | Chair | 26 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Gillian Kerr | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Robert Cook | Trustee | 22 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Carol Gardner | Trustee | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alistair David Wells | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.42k | £69.73k | £94.96k | £188.13k | £159.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.83k | £89.07k | £118.34k | £137.91k | £163.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF PRAYER, ADVICE, LISTENING, SHELTER, FOOD AND OTHER SERVICES AS PART OF THE HEALING MINISTRY OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH. 2 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, THE PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, ISLE OF WIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carisbrooke Priory Trust Co Ltd
39 Whitcombe Road
Newport
PO30 1YS
- Phone:
- 01983523354
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window