MYSTICAL ROSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching, teaching, evangelism. Publication of books and cd's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Czech Republic
- Kenya
- Namibia
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Uganda
- United States
- Zambia
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev IAN ROBERT WALTERS | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Dominic O'Connor | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Lynn Williams | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Derek Williams | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Francis Harwood | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.87k | £53.41k | £43.08k | £48.01k | £23.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.44k | £49.62k | £52.76k | £48.43k | £22.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PREACH AND REACH THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST AND TO EVANGELISE MEMBERS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND OTHERS ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Hillside
East Barsham
FAKENHAM
Norfolk
NR21 0LE
- Phone:
- 07780832443
- Email:
- derekbdiv@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window