BROMLEY LITTLE THEATRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Theatre aims to promote, maintain, improve and advance education in relation to all aspects of dramatic art and the encouragement of the Arts. It aims to provide opportunities for anyone who wants to be involved in theatre and to become a vibrant community hub for diversity and inclusivity in the centre of Bromley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
- BRAMLEY LITTLE THEATRE LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE CHRISTOPHER WALLACE | Chair | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Simon Tyrrell-Lewis | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON SHOMADE | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Batson | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE GISSING | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA-ANN JENNER | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA JANE FfRANCON DAVIES | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GISSING | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE ARMOUR | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.41k | £64.33k | £88.07k | £95.96k | £211.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.05k | £74.50k | £89.02k | £83.09k | £190.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.27k | £56.19k | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
15 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS, OPERAS, OPERETTAS, MUSICALS AND DANCE, AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bromley Little Theatre Ltd
North Street
Bromley
BR1 1SB
- Phone:
- 02031891690
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window