ROTARY CLUB OF CANTERBURY SUNRISE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply the trust fund for the relief of the poor and needy or such other charitable activities as the Rotary Club of Canterbury Sunrise shall direct
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 04 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JARLE STEPHEN RONALD TATT | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Sissons | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GARY KEVIN ROBINSON | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Pauline Davis | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|||||
PETER WOOLNOUGH | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.48k | £4.65k | £11.32k | £13.72k | £70.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.89k | £6.00k | £9.94k | £9.67k | £23.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST MADE 25 JUNE 2008 as amended on 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CANTERBURY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Appledown House
Barton Business Park
New Dover Road
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 3TE
- Phone:
- 07973297085
- Email:
- jarle@noeltatt.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window