Financial history PRINCE OF TIDES WESTLEY ODGER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1126563
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £23.72k £54.31k £33.10k £46.85k £28.69k
Total expenditure £8.50k £21.12k £40.10k £75.79k £23.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A