TRUE VINE TRUST FOR TANZANIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main project is building and supporting a Secondary School in the Maasai Steppe. Opened in January 2011 We support Agape in starting a High school. Medical equipment, is supplied to hospitals and dispensaries. We helped establish a diagnostic/treatment centre in an area where one is desperately needed. We are a Christian Charity serving the indigent people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Tanzania
Governance
- 11 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HAWKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE ROSEMARY SCHAD | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STEPHEN SCHAD | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA MARGARET PRESTON | Trustee | 09 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
NADINE JOAN NOREEN HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.32k | £69.45k | £45.32k | £59.79k | £210.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.78k | £57.42k | £43.75k | £59.52k | £209.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT AND DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATION, HEALTHCARE AND VOCATIONAL HEADS IN TANZANIA
Area of benefit
TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MILL LANE
LONG WHATTON
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 5BD
- Phone:
- 01509646957
- Email:
- nadine.hawkins45@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window