SUPERKIDZ COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian youth organisation providing facilities for recreational occupation, & social & psychological welfare for deprived persons to improve their conditions of life in London.To advance education, training and employment, divert from crime, relieve sickness and financial hardship,to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services, counselling and support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
Governance
- 04 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathleen Alyson McGarrigle | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Caroline Louise Risdon | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Helen Hyland | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAM MOODY | Trustee | 20 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MOODY | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.73k | £259.01k | £117.37k | £277.12k | £226.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.86k | £224.46k | £237.16k | £208.77k | £185.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £23.00k | £3.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
A TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK B TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM RO THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT C TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Refectory, St Saviours Church
98 Middle Park Avenue
Eltham
London
SE9 5JH
- Phone:
- 02088596403
- Email:
- SUPERKIDZFUNDING@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window