ALEX HOUSE-FRIENDS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide leisure activities and intergration opportunities for children and young people with disabilities. We are able to provide specilist equipment for the young people, sensory equipment, outdoor doors. we have also bought specialist cycles and promote cycling for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 01 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 31 December 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 January 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 15 January 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SEVERE LEARNING AND/OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND WHO ARE RECEIVING RESPITE AT ALEX HOUSE, LANCASTER BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL FACILITIES AND RECREATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES FOR RESIDENTS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALEXANDRA HOUSE
WESTBOURNE DRIVE
LANCASTER
LA1 5EE
- Phone:
- 07826876180
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window