THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, JESUS CHRIST ASSEMBLY, BATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SERVICE TIME SUNDAY SERVICE 11AM TO 1PM WEDNESDAY PRAYERS 5:30PM TO 7PM SATURDAY EVANGELISM 4PM TO 5PM SATURDAY CHOIR PRACTICE 5PM TO 7PM CHRISTIAN WORSHIP, PREACHING THE TRUE WORD OF GOD. COUNSELLING, PRAYERS ETC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 September 2008: Standard registration
- RCCG - JESUS KINGDOM CITY BATH (Working name)
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, JESUS CHRIST ASSEMBLY, BATH. (Working name)
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - JESUS KINGDOM CITY BATH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tackler Gomera | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nkechi Ayodele-Atunwa | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Blessing Mutandwa | Trustee | 24 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA LOUISE SIMBEYE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.42k | £70.00k | £119.79k | £60.17k | £43.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.67k | £36.08k | £34.64k | £22.96k | £35.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 December 2023 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2023 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2023 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2022 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 April 2022 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 JULY 2008 as amended on 22 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLD-WIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Abbotswood Close
Keynsham
BRISTOL
BS31 1FR
- Phone:
- 07410 692 618
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window