UK- PATLI DARUL ULOOM MADRASHA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING THE MADRASHA IN PATLI, BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EDUCATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

24 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 23 October 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOULANA ASGOR HUSSAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Muhammed Amir Uddin | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Miraz Miah | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheikh Mufazzul Hussain | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mufti Moinul Islam | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Ahmed Hussain Choudhury | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suleman Miah | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MD Zaman Choudhury | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MD AKMAN HUSSAIN CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
LAK MIAH | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOULANA GULZAR AHMED | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR ABDUL MASABBIR | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOULANA MD SADIKUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EMDADUL HAQUE MILON | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD SUZOL MIAH | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR ASHRAF AHMED | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR MD ABUL KALAM | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABU BAKAR QURESHI | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL GOFUR CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SUBA IBN NOZIR | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
EHSANUL ABDUL KARIM HOQUE | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SISHU MIAH | Trustee | 30 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ABUL KOHER CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUFI UDDIN AHMAD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.22k | £56.93k | £53.77k | £39.28k | £47.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.68k | £49.25k | £35.11k | £31.50k | £33.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 13 SEPTEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING THE MADRASHA IN PATLI, BANGLADESH BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR EDUCATION AT THE MADRASHA.
Area of benefit
THE MADRASHA IN PATLI, BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Warwick Gardens
ILFORD
IG1 4LE
- Phone:
- 07956517323
- Email:
- info@patlimadrasha.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window