THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION BARNSLEY & DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 1125662
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raffles, Remembrance Concert November 2012,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £100
Total expenditure: £100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 August 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION BARNSLEY BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM TAYLOR Chair
None on record
Dean Vincent Barmby Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Councillor Joe Hayward Trustee 18 June 2018
THE SHAW LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
TADS (THERAPIES FOR ANXIETY, DEPRESSION AND STRESS)
Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days
THE BARNSLEY AND DISTRICT PRISONER OF WAR AND EX-SERVICEMEN AND WOMEN'S FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.05k £5.18k £100 £100 £100
Total expenditure £1.05k £5.40k £100 £100 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 February 2021 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
14 Richard Road
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S71 1UY
Phone:
07548267366
Website:

No information available