Trustees CHILD RIGHTS INTERNATIONAL NETWORK - CRIN
Charity number: 1125925

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Tuite | Chair | 29 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jerusha Maliza Burnham | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin In-Chuen Koh | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tomas Ayuso | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Enakshi Ganguly Thukral | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aoife Nolan | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Sandberg | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adem Arkadas-Thibert | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
EVA CHRISTINA GEIDENMARK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.