Accounts and annual returns PETER ALAN DICKSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 August 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required