Financial history PETER ALAN DICKSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.05k £12.10k
Total expenditure £14.87k £486 £5.63k £3.47k £1.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A