MARINE SUPPORT & TRAINING SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a safe and enjoyable learning environment, where members learn about small craft handling, engineering and the operational support needed to keep a vessel in the water. We also provide external challenges at a variety of locations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 21 October 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- MSTS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.75k | £1.71k | £902 | £304 | £302 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £1.47k | £2.15k | £930 | £1.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 07 March 2017 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 DECEMBER 2003 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE, PEOPLE OF ALL AGES THROUGH: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY SEAMANSHIP AND NAVIGATION. B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS RESPONSIBLE PEOPLE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window