CLYTHA GROUP RDA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE SOUTH EAST WALES AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 06 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Joanne Tooze | Chair | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela McGregor | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Muriel Gould | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Pinkerton Spencer | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bettina Belinda Boxhall-James | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julie Alexander | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Morgan | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Richards | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL GILLIAN WOLVERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £245 | £276 | £3.49k | £9.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.63k | £731 | £1.10k | £1.70k | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 September 2022 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEBRUARY 2008
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE SOUTH EAST WALES AREA
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Woodspring
Trostrey
USK
USK
NP16 6AR
- Phone:
- 07825342659
- Email:
- Clytharda@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window