Accounts and annual returns WHITTINGTON PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1134247
Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 23 May 2023 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 01 April 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 April 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 April 2022 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 April 2022 366 days late Download Open in new window